Sl No | Name | Designation | Service Duration | Home District |
1 | Md. Omar Ali | General Manager | 01.08.1998-08.08.2004 | Natore |
2 | Praloy Kumar Saha | General Manager | 09.08.2004- 15.03.2008 | Manikganj |
3 | A. H. M Rezaullah Khan | General Manager | 20.03.2008 - 18.08.2009 | Tangail |
4 | Md. Abul Kalam | General Manager | 19.08.2009 - 13.09.2012 | Barisal |
5 | Md. Mahbub Ali | General Manager (Add. Charge) | 13.09.2012 - 06.04.2013 | Jashore |
6 | Md. Altaf Hossain | General Manager | 06.04.2013 - 14.01.2017 | Jashore |
7 | Md. Quamrul Islam Golder | General Manager | 17.01.2017 - 18.09.2020 | Khulna |
Planning and Implementation: Cabinet Division, A2I, BCC, DoICT and BASIS